judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LARK (STEPHANIE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45946
Short Caption:LARK (STEPHANIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35171 , 35194 , 35204 , 41460 , 48447 , 55734
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C157462Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/10/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/16/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/16/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-18489
09/30/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 05-19511
11/10/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 6. 05-22198
11/10/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/21/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06R-MD/RR/RP 05-24863
01/17/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-00509
01/17/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/25/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 19, 2006. 06-00509