judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DIANA CALIMLIM DAVIS, f/k/a DIANA CALIMLIM GILL v. MATTHEW A. GILL

Case Heading (06-88)
Case Number:06-88Case Docketed On:04/24/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:DIANA CALIMLIM DAVIS, f/k/a DIANA CALIMLIM GILL v. MATTHEW A. GILL
Full Title:DIANA CALIMLIM DAVIS, f/k/a DIANA CALIMLIM GILL, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. MATTHEW A. GILL, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDiana Calimlim DavisLisa M. Barrett-Oliver
AppelleeMatthew Gill Pro Se

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/24/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/24/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/24/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/24/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/24/2006Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
04/26/2006Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
05/18/2006Motion - Withdrawal of counsel for appelleeMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
05/19/2006Response/Objection - Motion to withdrawResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
05/30/2006Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
06/07/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
06/07/2006Event - Phone Call to former counsel for appellee to confirm appellee's addressEventPhone CallFinal
06/07/2006Event - Phone Call to counsel for appellant and advised address on certificate of service not current address for appelleeEventPhone CallFinal
06/08/2006Service - Certificate of service amended to reflect appellee's correct addressServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
07/26/2006Brief - Failure to file - appellee, case maturedBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
07/26/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/08/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volumes I & II, Original Papers; Volume III, Confidential FolderRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/08/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/08/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/30/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/16/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal