judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD W. RICHARDSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0982
Short Caption:RONALD W. RICHARDSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-16617-08Filed Date:08/06/2010

Opening Event Date:08/06/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/29/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/18/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/18/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/22/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRonald W. Richardson YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/06/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/18/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Daniel Dorsey, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
08/18/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Daniel Dorsey, Esquire
08/24/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
10/28/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (94 pgs/Johnson) 5/10/10 proc.
10/28/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (9 pgs/Johnson) 5/11/10 proc. w/cd
10/29/2010RECORD INDEX
10/29/2010RECORD COPIES
10/29/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/02/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/13/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/13/2010APPENDIX
01/18/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
01/18/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
04/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
05/18/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/18/2011SUBMITTED to Judges Washington, Thompson, Farrell
06/30/2011FiledAFFIRMED (MOJ) (Washignton, Chief Judge, Thompson, Associate Judge, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
07/18/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellee)
07/22/2011FiledMandate