judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MRS. A. R. RICHARDSON v. C. R. HART

Case: A-360
A-360
11/04/1944
MISC PETITION
MRS. A. R. RICHARDSON
C. R. HART
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/27/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/06/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
11/13/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/27/1945Motion for Rehearing
12/06/1944Brief on the Merits
11/22/1944Letter Filed
11/22/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/13/1944Response to Petition
11/04/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mrs. A. R. RichardsonPetitioner
C. R. HartRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information