judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVE M. SMITH v. ROBERT JOHN BRITO, JR.,

Case Heading (S-07-0137)
Case Number:S-07-0137Case Docketed On:06/27/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Elections (Title 22)
Short Title:DAVE M. SMITH v. ROBERT JOHN BRITO, JR.,
Full Title:DAVE M. SMITH, Appellant (Defendant), v. ROBERT JOHN BRITO, JR., Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDave M. SmithRalph E. Wood
AppelleeRobert John Brito Jr.Clark D. Stith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 191
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/27/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/27/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/27/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/08/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
09/21/2007Brief - Appellee, received copy of brief on cdBriefAppelleeFinal
09/26/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/09/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
10/15/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume. Volume I, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/15/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
12/10/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/26/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/26/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/31/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 12/27/07 by Marilyn Jensen.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal