judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN PATRICK SMITH V. DENISE JACOBS

Case Information: 10-AA-0983
Short Caption:JOHN PATRICK SMITH V. DENISE JACOBSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:OAH-DOES37-09Filed Date:08/13/2010

Opening Event Date:08/13/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/28/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJohn Patrick Smith NPro SeN
RespondentDenise Jacobs NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/13/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
08/13/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
08/13/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
08/18/2010 ORDERED that petitioner shall W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, ADVISE THIS COURT AS TO THE I.D. of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources Inc, v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the DC, 785, A.2d 300, 304 (DC 2001);... It is *****MORE******
08/18/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that PETITIONER shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 15 (a)(2);... (BY:ETW)
08/18/2010TMC - OTSC
10/07/2010 ORDERED that the above-captioned PETITION IS DISMISSED as having been UNTIMELY FILED... (RDPRTE) (rl)
10/07/2010DISMISSED
10/26/2010RECEIVED - a letter from Petitioner stating his disargreement w/the court's decision on this appeal ***********LETTER DOES NOT ADDRESS ****************UNTIMELINESS OF APPEAL *****************NO ACTION TAKEN ******PER RM (lw)
10/28/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived