judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARY A. BERRY, and MERRY BERRY, INC., A Wyoming Corporation, d/b/a Fountain of Youth RV Park v. PAMELA TESSMAN

Case Heading (S-07-0027)
Case Number:S-07-0027Case Docketed On:02/05/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Hot Springs CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law
Short Title:MARY A. BERRY, and MERRY BERRY, INC., A Wyoming Corporation, d/b/a Fountain of Youth RV Park v. PAMELA TESSMAN
Full Title:MARY A. BERRY, and MERRY BERRY, INC., A Wyoming Corporation, d/b/a Fountain of Youth RV Park, Appellants (Defendants), v. PAMELA TESSMAN, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMary A. BerryMichael Charles Steel
Jacob L. Brooks
AppellantMerry Berry, Inc.Michael Charles Steel
Jacob L. Brooks
AppellantFountain of Youth RV ParkMichael Charles Steel
Jacob L. Brooks
AppelleePamela TessmanDavid B. Hooper

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Other, Property
Opinion Number:2007 WY 175
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/05/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/05/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/05/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/20/2007Correspondence - Incoming. Received copy of letter from counsel for appellant to District Court Clerk regarding index.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
02/23/2007Notice-Incoming - Other. Received amended index from Clerk of District Court.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/26/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
05/10/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/21/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgments - oral argument setting - David B. HooperNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/21/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Michael C. SteelNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/01/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, five volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Trial Transcripts; Volume III, Depositions; Volumes IV - V, ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/12/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Michael Charles Steel for appellants; David B. Hooper for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/12/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/02/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/15/2007Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
12/04/2007Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
12/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/04/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/04/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/06/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal