judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COUNTY OF CLARK VS. DECATUR SHOPPING CENTER

Case Information: 34609
Short Caption:COUNTY OF CLARK VS. DECATUR SHOPPING CENTERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A377160Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/12/1999 / Christensen, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/03/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07084
08/12/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas F. Christensen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/13/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: March 29, 1999. To Court Reporter: Kris Johnson. 99-07504
01/28/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-01430
01/28/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-01431
02/14/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SNP/CLK 00-02250
02/14/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.