Case: 05-12-01170-CR
05-12-01170-CR
08/22/2012
Sexual Assault
Parker, Jared Cody
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/19/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State |
| ||
11/19/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/19/2013 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
07/09/2013 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
07/09/2013 | Retention time case file will be retained | Retain | | ||||
06/18/2013 | Submitted | | |||||
04/04/2013 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||
12/19/2012 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
12/19/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
12/19/2012 | State brief due | | |||||
11/19/2012 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
11/19/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
11/19/2012 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||
11/17/2012 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
10/28/2012 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
10/25/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
10/24/2012 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed |
| |||||
10/23/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
10/19/2012 | Letter Sent by the Court |
| |||||
10/19/2012 | Trial court certification filed |
| |||||
10/05/2012 | Letter Sent by the Court |
| |||||
10/04/2012 | No reporters record filed in criminal case |
| |||||
09/28/2012 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
09/23/2012 | Record due | | |||||
08/22/2012 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||
08/22/2012 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
08/03/2012 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
07/25/2012 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/22/2020 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State Of Texas, The | Criminal - State of Texas | Karla Baugh |
Parker, Jared Cody | Criminal - Appellant | Barrett Keith Brown Barrett Keith Brown |
Trial Court Information
59th Judicial District Court
Grayson
057080-59
Grayson County Reporter, 59th District Court
10 Yrs TDCJ/$5077 Fine