judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Fortitude Energy, LLC v. Sooner Pipe LLC

Case: 01-17-00501-CV
01-17-00501-CV
07/06/2017
Contract
Fortitude Energy, LLC
Sooner Pipe LLC
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
11/06/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
10/23/2017Reply brief filedAppellant
10/23/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
09/22/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
09/22/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
01/04/2019Sent to publisher
11/16/2018Mandate issued
09/14/2018Motion for rehearing was not filed
09/14/2018Motion for rehearing due
08/30/2018Opinion issuedAffirm TC judgment in part, reverse TC judgment in part, and remand case to TC for further proceedings
08/30/2018Judgment Issued
06/19/2018Submitted
05/17/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied
11/27/2017Reply brief due
11/14/2017Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/06/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested
11/06/2017Reply brief due
11/06/2017Response due
11/03/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/25/2017Notice of late brief
10/23/2017Reply brief filed
10/23/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested
10/23/2017Appellees brief due
10/23/2017Appellees brief due
09/22/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested
09/22/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested
09/22/2017Appellants brief due
09/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/06/2017Deadline to conduct mediation
09/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/01/2017Appellants brief due
08/24/2017No settlement reached during mediation
08/24/2017Letter from parties or mediator concerning mediation result
08/07/2017Deadline for parties to select mediator
08/07/2017Record due
08/04/2017Mediation set to be conducted
08/02/2017Clerks record filed
07/27/2017Court fee due
07/27/2017Docketing statement due
07/24/2017Fee paid
07/21/2017Order enteredMediation
07/12/2017Docketing statement filed
07/11/2017Docketing statement filed
07/10/2017Letter issued by the court
07/06/2017Case began in court of appeals
07/06/2017Notice of appeal received
07/06/2017Notice of appeal received
07/05/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court
05/05/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court
04/07/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/16/2018Case StoredCase stored
11/16/2024RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fortitude Energy, LLC AppellantJames J. Hansen
Sooner Pipe LLC AppelleeJared Isaac Levinthal
Kaitlyn Faucett
Trial Court Information
189th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge 189th District Court
2016-31946
Court Reporter 189th District Court