judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Rebecca Victoria Humaran v. The State of Texas

Case: 14-14-00421-CR
14-14-00421-CR
06/02/2014
Murder
Rebecca Victoria Humaran
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
04/23/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedState
02/23/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
03/15/2016Case stored
03/15/2016Mandate issued
03/08/2016Mandate due to be issued
02/10/2016Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsREFUSED
12/16/2015Petition for discretionary review due
12/14/2015Case forwarded to higher court
12/11/2015Petition for discretionary review filed
11/16/2015Petition for discretionary review due
11/13/2015Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsGRANTED
10/30/2015Motion for rehearing was not filed
10/30/2015Motion for rehearing due
10/15/2015Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
09/22/2015Submitted
08/05/2015Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied
07/31/2015Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied
04/24/2015State brief due
04/23/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested
04/23/2015Case ready to be set
03/25/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
03/25/2015State brief due
03/24/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/20/2015Appellants brief due
02/23/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested
02/10/2015Order entered
02/10/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedDENIED
02/05/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/05/2015Supplemental reporters record filed
02/05/2015Appellants brief due
11/25/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
11/24/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/20/2014Response due
11/10/2014Notice of late brief
11/05/2014Appellants brief due
10/06/2014Exhibits filed
10/06/2014Reporters record filed
09/22/2014Extension of time to file reporters record filed
09/22/2014Reporters record due
08/22/2014Reporters record due
08/21/2014Extension of time to file clerks record filed
07/22/2014Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGRANTED
07/22/2014Extension of time to file reporters record filed
07/22/2014Reporters record due
07/22/2014Record due
07/16/2014Clerks record filed
06/24/2014Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record
06/09/2014Document filed
06/02/2014Court reporters information sheet sent
06/02/2014Trial court clerks certification of record requested
06/02/2014Case began in court of appeals
05/23/2014Notice of appeal filed in trial court
05/23/2014Sentence imposed in the trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/15/2016RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
03/15/2016Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of Texas Ex Rel, Travis J. Koehn, Austin County District AttorneyCriminal - State of TexasTrey David Picard
Humaran Stinnett, Rebecca VictoriaCriminal - AppellantCrespin Michael Linton
Trial Court Information
239th District Court
Brazoria
68647
Jill Friedrichs
50 Yrs. TDCJ