judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BUSH (BRIAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34796
Short Caption:BUSH (BRIAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9900864HClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/22/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/09/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/09/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08490
10/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34695, 34779, 34796. 99-09637
12/22/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 99-13056
12/22/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/17/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] Nos. 34796, 35480. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-04229
04/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-05807
04/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 17, 2000. 00-05807