judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SYDNEY E. SMITH V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 10-CO-0998
Short Caption:SYDNEY E. SMITH V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL9156-98Filed Date:08/11/2010

Opening Event Date:08/11/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/31/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/18/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSydney E. Smith YPro SeN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Mary L. WilsonNY
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/11/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/24/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 11, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
08/31/2010RECORD INDEX
08/31/2010RECORD COPIES
08/31/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JJ) For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
10/29/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
10/29/2010RECEIVED Appellant's Brief (malb pend). (and appendix included in the brief)dfe
11/18/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
11/18/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix
12/17/2010APPELLEE'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to substituted as aple and for enlargement of time to file brief 30 days
12/30/2010RECEIVED Appellant's objection to Appellee's Motion for Substition and for Enlargement of Time.
01/04/2011APLT MOTION to supplement appellant's brief (Motion and brief is one document)
01/18/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 2/18/11. (D.C.)
02/11/2011ORDER GRANT the District of Columbia to substitute as appellee. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion to supplement his brief is granted and the Clerk shall file the lodged supplemental brief. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's motions for extensions of time within which to file the brief are granted to the extent that the consolidated brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: ETW)
02/11/2011APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM
03/11/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
03/14/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance
05/25/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED EXCEPT to the extent provided below...SEE HARDCOPY It is ***MORE***
05/25/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that in light of APPELLEE'S CONCESSION ON APPEAL that the two knives should be returned, but not to the incarcerated appellant personally, the CASE IS REMANDED and the trial court shall amend its JULY 29, 2010 ORDER...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE****
05/25/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that in all other respects the order on appeal IS AFFIRMED. (RZTHNB)
06/07/2011APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING
07/11/2011FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing
07/18/2011FiledMandate
06/04/2012LodgedMotion to correct a Judgement (Titled as: Petition to correct a Judgement) (Appellant)
06/14/2012FiledLetter To Sydney Smith, informing him that his matter has been closed; returning submissions
09/13/2012LodgedMotion to correct a Judgement (Titled as: Petition to correct a Judgement) (Appellant)