judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

David Schlittler v. The State of Texas

Case: 12-13-00269-CR
12-13-00269-CR
08/28/2013
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
David Schlittler
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
02/11/2014Brief received - oral argument not requestedState
02/11/2014Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
01/14/2014Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
10/20/2016Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/17/2016Internal memo
08/29/2016Mandate issued
08/24/2016Motion for rehearing deniedMotion or Writ Denied
06/06/2016Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/06/2016Order entered
05/24/2016Case stored
05/23/2016Mandate issued
04/27/2016Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/30/2015Sent to publisher
02/25/2015Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
11/17/2014Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals
11/14/2014Motion for rehearing was not filed
11/13/2014Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant
10/30/2014Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/30/2014Submitted
09/09/2014Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied
02/13/2014Prescreened
02/13/2014Electronic Motion for extension of time to file brief dispMotion or Writ Granted
02/11/2014Case ready to be set
02/11/2014Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested
02/11/2014Brief received - oral argument not requested
02/10/2014Electronic Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/14/2014Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested
12/18/2013Electronic Motion for extension of time to file brief dispMotion or Writ Granted
12/17/2013Electronic Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/12/2013Supplemental reporters record filed
12/09/2013Letter received
11/18/2013Reporters record filed
11/18/2013Telephone inquiry to or from the court
11/05/2013Internal memo
11/04/2013Notice of late recordOrder Setting Final Deadline
10/30/2013Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/24/2013Extension of time to file reporters record filed
10/17/2013Notice of late recordWarning from the Court
10/09/2013Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ No Action Taken
10/04/2013Extension of time to file reporters record filed
09/20/2013Notice of late record
09/19/2013Appearance of counsel
09/09/2013Docketing statement filed
09/06/2013Letter filed
09/04/2013Letter withdrawn by the court
09/03/2013Electronic Clerks Record Filed
08/30/2013Telephone call received
08/28/2013Appellant notified that notice of appeal late/show grounds to continue
08/28/2013Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk
08/28/2013Court packet sent to parties
08/28/2013Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
08/05/2013Notice of appeal filed in trial court
05/21/2013Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court
05/15/2013Trial court certification filed
05/15/2013Sentence imposed in the trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/24/2016Case StoredCase stored
05/24/2041RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMr. Douglas E. Lowe
Ms. Melinda Fletcher
Schlittler, David Criminal - AppellantMr. Kenneth Nash
Trial Court Information
3rd District Court
Anderson
Honorable Deborah Oakes Evans
30390
Brandi Ray
8 Years/TDCJ-CID