Register of Actions
Case No. 23-0772-K26
The State of Texas VS Keco Lamont Motton | § § § § § |
|
Lead Attorneys | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Motton, Keco Lamont | Black DOD: 05/10/2023 5' 7", 215 lbs | ||
State of Texas | The State of Texas | |||
Charges: Motton, Keco Lamont | Statute | Level | Date | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | SEXUAL ASSAULT | 22.011(a)(1) PC | 2nd Degree Felony | 05/04/2023 | |
DISPOSITIONS | |||
---|---|---|---|
06/07/2023 | Disposition (Judicial Officer: King, Donna) 1. SEXUAL ASSAULT Dismissal | ||
OTHER EVENTS AND HEARINGS | |||
05/08/2023 | Information DC - OCA /Starts Clock | ||
05/08/2023 | Bond Set by Magistrate | ||
05/08/2023 | Probable Cause Affidavit/Non-OCA/no clock | ||
05/08/2023 | Pre-Trial Release Conditions | ||
05/08/2023 | Bond Conditions - REPORTABLE TCIC | ||
05/09/2023 | Surety Bond | ||
05/12/2023 | Notice of Setting | ||
06/07/2023 | Order to Dismiss | ||
06/13/2023 | CANCELED Pre-Indictment Docket Call (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers King, Donna, King, Donna) Case Dismissed |
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
23-0772-K26 | Motton, Keco Lamont | 05/08/2023 | Felony Disposed |
|