Case: 13-15-00296-CV
13-15-00296-CV
07/07/2015
Mandamus
In Re Benevis, LLC, Dentistry of Brownsville, P.C., and Kool Smiles, P.C.
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/24/2015 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | | |||
07/07/2015 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/07/2015 | Motion for emergency relief disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
08/07/2015 | Petition for writ of mandamus disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
07/24/2015 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | | |||||
07/21/2015 | Memorandum opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||
07/21/2015 | Petition for writ of mandamus disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
07/21/2015 | Submitted | | |||||
07/17/2015 | Response filed | | |||||
07/10/2015 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
07/10/2015 | Sealed exhibits filed | | |||||
07/08/2015 | Motion to stay disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
07/08/2015 | Order entered |
| |||||
07/07/2015 | Fee paid | | |||||
07/07/2015 | Sworn record filed | | |||||
07/07/2015 | Motion to stay filed | | |||||
07/07/2015 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/21/2015 | Case Stored | Case stored |
07/21/2021 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Gonzalez, Noe | Respondent | |
Paula Antu as Next Friend of E.A., A Minor, Scarlett Ayala as Next Friend of X.U., A Minor, Guadalupe Cepeda, as Next Friend of O.C., A Minor, and Laura Cornejo, et al. | Real party in interest | Hon. Michael E. Flanagan Hon. Kimberly S. Keller Hon. Roberto D. Guerra Hon. George W. Mauze III Hon. Tom Bagby |
Benevis, LLC., Denistry of Brownsville, P.C., and Kool Smiles, P.C. | Relator | Hon. Eduardo Roberto Rodriguez Hon. Alan R. Vickery Hon. Wayne B. Mason |
Trial Court Information
370th District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Noe Gonzalez
C-0184-13-G