judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

RALPH C. MYERS, STATE OF TEXAS, ET AL. v. J. E. THOMAS, ET AL.

Case: A-345
A-345
10/16/1944
Application for Writ of Error
RALPH C. MYERS, STATE OF TEXAS, ET AL.
J. E. THOMAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
04/18/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/04/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
10/25/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
10/16/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
10/16/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
04/18/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/10/1945Document received (See Remarks)
01/10/1945Document received (See Remarks)
01/01/1945Document received (See Remarks)
11/04/1944Response to Petition
10/25/1944Response to Petition
10/16/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
10/16/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
10/16/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State of Texas, et al.Petitioner
Ralph C. MyersPetitioner
J. E. Thomas, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information