judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TOWER REALTY AND DEVELOPMENT VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34795
Short Caption:TOWER REALTY AND DEVELOPMENT VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36851
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A307489Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/09/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Perry & Spann-check no. 0010704.
09/09/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively Writ of Mandate. 99-08485
09/21/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. 99-08928
10/14/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time within which to File Answer to Writ of Prohibition, or in the Alternative, Writ of Mandamus. 99-09963
10/20/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The answer to the petition for a writ of prohibition provisionally submitted on October 18, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. 99-10196
10/20/1999Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer to Writ of Prohibition, or in the alternative, Writ of Mandamus. 99-10052
01/25/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Filed Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. " . . . we deny the petition." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-01232
02/23/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-02819
02/23/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.