judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MATTHEW LUCAS HOLADAY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-93)
Case Number:06-93Case Docketed On:05/01/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Children/Protection 14-3-101 - 14-3-440 (Title 14)
Short Title:MATTHEW LUCAS HOLADAY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MATTHEW LUCAS HOLADAY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMatthew Lucas HoladayKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/01/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/01/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/01/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/16/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/20/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/02/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/03/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/15/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/18/2006Order - Grant - third extension of time (no further extensions considered)OrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
10/17/2006Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiver (faxed)MotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
10/18/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
10/18/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/19/2006Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appeal (original)Notice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal