judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EUSEBIO FLORES HERRERA V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0997
Short Caption:EUSEBIO FLORES HERRERA V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD7622-10Filed Date:08/10/2010

Opening Event Date:08/10/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/06/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/23/2010
Argued/Submitted:05/17/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/20/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEusebio Flores Herrera YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/10/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/24/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that William Farley, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
08/24/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) William Farley, Esquire
09/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (40pgs/Tape) 8/9/10 proc. w/CD included
09/21/2010RECORD INDEX
09/21/2010RECORD COPIES
09/21/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
10/06/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (5pgs/Tape) 5/4/10 proc.
10/06/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (4pgs/Tape) 5/24/10 proc.
10/06/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (10pgs/Tape) 7/9/10 proc. w/CD included
10/06/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/15/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/18/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
11/18/2010APPENDIX
12/23/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
12/23/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/07/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
02/17/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
04/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
05/17/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/17/2011SUBMITTED to Glickman,Belson,Nebeker.
05/26/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Glickman, Associate Judge, and Nebeker and Belson, Senior Judges.)
06/15/2011CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER
06/20/2011MANDATE ISSUED