judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WOMACK VS. CATENA

Case Information: 34789
Short Caption:WOMACK VS. CATENACourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34742
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A405576Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Leavitt for Senior Justice YoungPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/17/1999 / Blumen, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/08/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lionel firm-check no. 106473.
09/08/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08466
09/08/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. (Lionel, Sawyer & Collins).
09/17/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Frasier Blumen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/25/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion of Counsel for Petitioners/Appellants to Withdraw as Counsel. 99-10411
11/17/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Recommended that this case be removed from the program. 99-11404
02/23/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 25, 1999, appellants' counsel filed a motion to withdraw as appellants' counsel of record. We grant counsel's motion to withdraw. Counsel shall have 10 days from the date of this order to serve a copy of this order on appellants and file proof of such service with this court. Appellants Jerry Womack and Iris Limited Partnership shall each have 30 days from the date of this order to obtain new counsel to represent them in this appeal and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court. On November 17, 1999, the settlement judge filed a settlement conference report recommending that this appeal be removed from the settlement conference program. We defer ruling on the settlement judge's recommendation until appellants have retained new counsel. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 00-02814
06/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, Hejmanowski and Frederick have failed to comply with our February 23, 2000 order. Hejmanowski and Frederick shall have 10 days from the date of this order to serve a copy of this order and the order of February 23, 2000, on appellants and file proof of such service with this court, or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to obtain new cunsel to represnet them in this appeal and cause counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 00-10523
06/29/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Report in Response to Order Entered June 20, 2000. 00-11109
09/14/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Confirm as Counsel. to attorney John McMillan of Jimmerson Hansen law firm. Due Date: 10 days
10/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. fn1[On November 17, 1999, the settlement judge filed a report recommending that this appeal be removed from the settlement program. We conclude that the recommendation is moot in light of this order, and disapprove it on that basis. It appears that this court has not been provided with the addresses of the proper person appellants. We direct the clerk of this court to serve a copy of this order upon former counsel for appellants, Lionel Sawyer & Collins, and direct counsel to provide copies of the order to appellants by mail to their last known address, and to provide proof of service to this court with 15 days of the date of this order.] "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP00A-WM/ML/NB 00-18034
10/12/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney Paul J. Hejmanowski of the Lionel Sawyer & Collins Law Firm in Las Vegas: pursuant to the Order Dismissing Appeal filed October 12, 2000, footnote 2, this order to be served upon the proper person appellants and provide proof of service to this court within 15 days of the date of this order.
11/07/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-18194
11/07/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/09/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Order Dismissing Appeal). Nos. 34742/34789. 00-19739
12/04/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2000. 00-18194