Case: 02-11-00261-CV
02-11-00261-CV
07/18/2011
Summary judgment
Brenda S. Guerra
M.H. Equities, Ltd. and Woodhaven MHC, Ltd.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/31/2012 | Reply brief filed | Appellant | |
01/09/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee | |
11/23/2011 | Amended brief filed | Appellant | |
08/22/2011 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/23/2012 | Mandate issued | | |||||
06/14/2012 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed in Part and Reversed & Remanded in Part |
| ||||
03/01/2012 | Submitted | | |||||
01/31/2012 | Reply brief filed | | |||||
01/09/2012 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
01/09/2012 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
01/09/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
12/12/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
12/09/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
12/09/2011 | Appearance of counsel | | |||||
11/23/2011 | Certificate of service filed | | |||||
11/23/2011 | Amended brief filed | | |||||
11/16/2011 | Certificate of service requested | | |||||
11/10/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
11/10/2011 | Certificate of service filed | | |||||
11/10/2011 | Certificate of conference filed | | |||||
11/09/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
10/27/2011 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||
09/30/2011 | Letter received | | |||||
09/29/2011 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
09/13/2011 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record | | |||||
09/08/2011 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||||
09/02/2011 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
08/22/2011 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | | |||||
08/22/2011 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
08/13/2011 | Affidavit of indigence for costs of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
08/02/2011 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||
08/02/2011 | Order entered | | |||||
07/29/2011 | Response filed | | |||||
07/19/2011 | Appellant notified that notice of appeal late/show grounds to continue | | |||||
07/18/2011 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/23/2012 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Woodhave MHC, Ltd. | Appellee | Coby D. Smith |
M.H. Equities, Ltd. | Appellee | Coby D. Smith |
Guerra, Brenda S. | Appellant | Brenda S. Guerra |
Trial Court Information
393rd District Court
Denton
Honorable Douglas M. Robison
2011-60081-393