Case: 05-18-01168-CR
05-18-01168-CR
10/04/2018
Habeas Corpus
Ex Parte: Larry James Budow
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/08/2018 | Letter brief filed | State |
| ||||
10/24/2018 | Letter brief filed | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/13/2019 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
12/04/2018 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposed | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||
12/04/2018 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
12/04/2018 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||||
11/12/2018 | Reply to response or motion filed |
| |||||
11/08/2018 | Letter brief filed |
| |||||
11/08/2018 | Letter brief due | | |||||
10/26/2018 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
10/24/2018 | Letter brief filed |
| |||||
10/24/2018 | Letter brief due | | |||||
10/24/2018 | Clerks record due | | |||||
10/23/2018 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed |
| |||||
10/11/2018 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
10/08/2018 | Order entered | Otherwise Disposed |
| ||||
10/04/2018 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
10/03/2018 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed |
| |||||
05/30/2018 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/13/2019 | Case Stored | Case stored |
12/04/2043 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Budow, Larry James | Criminal - Appellant | Larry James Budow |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | John Creuzot Joshua Vanderslice |
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 9
Dallas
Honorable Peggy Hoffman
MC18A1502
Sandra L. Moreland