Case: 13-11-00325-CV
13-11-00325-CV
05/19/2011
Summary judgment
REYES URBINA
DESIGNER HOMES CO., INC., ONESIMO MARTINEZ, JAVIER VILLESCAS [ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS JAVIER BILOLESCAS OR BILLESCAS], COMPASS BANK AND GREGORY S. KAZEN, IN HIS CAPACITY ONLY AS SUBSTITUTE TRUSTEE
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/27/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
12/27/2011 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/13/2012 | Case stored | | |||||
07/09/2012 | Mandate issued | | |||||
04/12/2012 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
04/12/2012 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Dismissed as Moot | | ||||
04/12/2012 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
04/11/2012 | Submitted | | |||||
03/06/2012 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
03/06/2012 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
02/13/2012 | Extension of time to file clerks record disposed | | |||||
02/13/2012 | Extension of time to file clerks record filed | | |||||
02/09/2012 | No clerks record filed in civil case | | |||||
02/02/2012 | Opposition filed | | |||||
01/24/2012 | Fee paid | | |||||
01/24/2012 | Motion to dismiss filed | | |||||
12/27/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
12/27/2011 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | | |||||
12/12/2011 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
12/12/2011 | Reporters record received not filed | | |||||
11/23/2011 | Letter filed | | |||||
11/16/2011 | Additional copies of documents received after initial filing | | |||||
11/15/2011 | Response filed | | |||||
11/03/2011 | Reply to response or motion filed | | |||||
11/03/2011 | Response requested by the court | | |||||
10/24/2011 | Fee paid | | |||||
10/20/2011 | Motion to dismiss filed | | |||||
10/06/2011 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||
10/04/2011 | Case reinstated | | |||||
10/04/2011 | Motion to reinstate disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
08/26/2011 | Fee paid | | |||||
08/26/2011 | Motion to reinstate filed | | |||||
08/25/2011 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
08/24/2011 | Submitted | | |||||
07/19/2011 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||
07/19/2011 | Telephone inquiry to or from the court | | |||||
06/09/2011 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
06/09/2011 | Fee paid | | |||||
06/09/2011 | Letter filed | | |||||
06/09/2011 | Mediation docketing statement returned | | |||||
06/09/2011 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
06/02/2011 | Notice of defect regarding perfection of the notice of appeal | | |||||
05/19/2011 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/09/2012 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Compass Bank | Appellee | Charles W. Downing Hon. Lisa Powell |
Villescas, Xavier | Appellee | Hon. Lisa Powell |
Urbina, Reyes | Appellant | Hon. Richard R. Alamia |
Designer Homes Co., Inc. | Appellee | Hon. Aaron I. Vela Sylvia Vega Flores |
Martinez, Onesimo | Appellee | Hon. Aaron I. Vela Sylvia Vega Flores |
Kazen, Gregory S. | Appellee | Hon. Lisa Powell Charles W. Downing |
Trial Court Information
275th District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Juan Ramon Partida
C-1939-10-E