judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Marcus Tyler Sheffield v. The State of Texas

Case: 03-15-00627-CR
03-15-00627-CR
10/06/2015
Sexual Assault
Marcus Tyler Sheffield
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
08/17/2016Brief was not filedState
07/18/2016Anders brief filedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
02/02/2017Mandate issuedAffirmed
11/21/2016Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/14/2016Motion for rehearing filed
11/02/2016Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant
10/27/2016Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
10/27/2016Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/14/2016Submitted
09/09/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/06/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/24/2016Set for submission on briefs
08/23/2016Case ready to be set
08/17/2016Brief was not filed
08/16/2016Pro Se appellant has received the clerk and/or the reporters record
08/11/2016Order enteredOrdered
08/11/2016Motion to access appellate record dispMotion or Writ Granted
08/09/2016Motion to access appellate record filed
07/18/2016Motion to withdraw attorney filed
07/18/2016Anders brief filed
07/06/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/05/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/19/2016Supplemental clerks record filed
05/17/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/17/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/17/2016Supplemental clerks record due
04/20/2016Exhibits filed
04/20/2016Reporters record filed
03/16/2016Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record
03/15/2016Notice of late record
01/04/2016Docketing statement filed
12/18/2015Supplemental clerks record filed
12/11/2015Letter received
12/11/2015Motion to withdraw appeal disposedDismissed as Moot
12/04/2015Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record
12/04/2015Telephone inquiry to or from the court
11/17/2015Notice of late record
11/10/2015Supplemental clerks record filed
11/06/2015Clerks record filed
10/20/2015Telephone inquiry to or from the court
10/16/2015Motion to withdraw appeal filed
10/06/2015Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/02/2017RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
02/02/2017Case StoredCase stored
04/20/2016StatusCase sealed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sheffield, Marcus TylerCriminal - AppellantMr. Marcus Tyler Sheffield
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMr. Joshua D. Presley
The Honorable Stacey M. Soule
Trial Court Information
207th District Court
Comal
Honorable Gary L. Steel
CR2011-575
Richard E. Roberts
20 years