judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DELEE VS. TURNIPSEED

Case Information: 34788
Short Caption:DELEE VS. TURNIPSEEDCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV14292Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/17/1999 / Cashill, Wm.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/05/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/08/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Allison firm-check no. 17437.
09/08/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08463
09/17/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William Patterson Cashill. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/20/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 25, 1999. 99-10248
11/08/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-10974
12/13/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Per NRAP 16(g), the settlement judge indicates that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant shall have 15 days to file the docketing statement and comply with NRAP 9(a). Appellants shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellants). 99-12519
12/27/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-13215
12/27/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-13216
04/11/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 11, 2000. 00-05781
05/10/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-07782
05/12/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The appellants' opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before June 12, 2000. 00-07937
06/12/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 6/12/00. 00-09924
06/12/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-09925
06/14/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Amended Certificate of Mailing (opening brief). 00-10106
07/14/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 7/14/00 (Reno/Carson). 00-12201
07/14/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-12202
07/17/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Hand delivered 7/17/00. 00-12320
07/17/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-12325
08/21/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 20, 2000. 00-14615
09/22/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 09/20/00. 00-16784
09/22/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. 00-16787
03/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. NNP01A-MS/RR/DA 01-03972
03/05/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/21/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. After reviewing the record, we conclude that the State Engineer's decision was based on substantial evidence. We therefore " . . . affirm the order of the district court affirming the decision of the State Engineer to deny the applications to appropriate groundwater." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-08399
06/18/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-08517
06/18/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/05/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 20, 2001. 01-08517