judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANNIE LEE CHISM v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-72)
Case Number:06-72Case Docketed On:03/31/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DANNIE LEE CHISM v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DANNIE LEE CHISM, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDannie Lee ChismKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
Ryan R. Roden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/31/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/31/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/31/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/16/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/16/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/30/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/05/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/16/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/17/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
08/23/2006Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
08/24/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
08/24/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal