Case: 05-18-00918-CV
05-18-00918-CV
08/13/2018
Miscellaneous/other civil
Tuan Khuu
Karen Moi
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/01/2019 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
02/14/2019 | Sent to publisher | | |||||
12/18/2018 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
12/18/2018 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||||
12/17/2018 | Submitted | | |||||
09/27/2018 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||
09/26/2018 | Letter filed |
| |||||
09/24/2018 | No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record |
| |||||
09/21/2018 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||
09/20/2018 | No clerks record filed in civil case |
| |||||
09/20/2018 | No reporters record filed in civil case |
| |||||
09/18/2018 | Record due | | |||||
08/14/2018 | Fee requested |
| |||||
08/14/2018 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
08/13/2018 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
07/31/2018 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
06/13/2018 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
05/21/2018 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/01/2019 | Case Stored | Case stored |
12/18/2024 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Moi, Karen | Appellee | Kevin Davidson |
Khuu, Tuan | Appellant | Kent Canada |
Trial Court Information
255th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Kim Cooks
DF-17-22683
Joie Rivera