judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHELLE MELINDA GRISE V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 10-CT-1000
Short Caption:MICHELLE MELINDA GRISE V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - DC Non-Traffic
Lead: 10-CT-0999 Consolidated:10-CT-1000
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CDC26097-06Filed Date:08/09/2010

Opening Event Date:08/09/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/21/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/11/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/04/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/14/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichelle Melinda Grise YPro SeN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Rosalyn Calbert GroceNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/09/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/27/2010ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 10-CT-999 and 10-CT-1000 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Jeffrey Light, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellants in these appeals. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellants shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeals have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for these appeals have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion on the records on appeals. (By: JAC)
08/27/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Jeffrey Light, Esquire
09/27/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt not yet ordered/needed)dfe
10/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (43pgs/Tape) 7/9/10 proc. w/cd
10/21/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/25/2010RECORD INDEX (10CT999)
10/25/2010RECORD COPIES (10CT999)
10/26/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/06/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 1/5/11 (both aplts)
12/15/2010 On consideration of appellants' motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellants' brief and the limited appendixes shall be filed on or before January 5, 2011. (By: JAC)
01/05/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF (Both)
01/05/2011APPENDIX - attached to brief (Both)
02/09/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 3/11/11
02/22/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before March 10, 2011. (By: JAC)
03/10/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE *****FILED AS THE BRIEF PER 5/11/11 ORDER LW
03/10/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD
03/14/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appellee's motion to supplement the record
05/11/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the document attached tothe motion as a supplemental record. It is ****MORE****
05/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 - Superior Court document
05/11/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS DENIED... SEE HARDCOPY It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's alternative request IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the motion as APPELLEE'S BRIEF. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits panel as soon as the calendar permits. (RZTHPR)
05/11/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF-SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE FILED AS THE BRIEF PER 5/11/11 ORDER LW
05/11/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/11/2011FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR - TMC
05/11/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
06/30/2011FiledLETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING (APLNT).
07/06/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING (Aple).
08/23/2011FiledRecord Index (10-CT-1000)
08/23/2011FiledRecord Copies (10-CT-1000)
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/04/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte removing from reg cal 11/17/11.
11/04/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Fisher, Reid, Farrell
11/04/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher, Associate Judge, Reid, Associate Judge, Retired, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
11/23/2011FiledMotion For Leave to Late File Petition for Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
11/23/2011LodgedPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
11/30/2011FiledOrder Granting motion for leave to file appellant's pet for reh en banc and the Clerk is directed to file the lodged petition.
11/30/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
02/02/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing en banc
02/14/2012FiledMandate
02/15/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
02/15/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Grise) (Appellant)