judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF BRADLEY DALE v. S & S BUILDERS, LLC and STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-07-0145)
Case Number:S-07-0145Case Docketed On:07/06/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF BRADLEY DALE v. S & S BUILDERS, LLC and STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF BRADLEY DALE, Appellant (Petitioner), v. S & S BUILDERS, LLC, Appellee (Employer), and STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBradley DaleEthelyn (Lynn) Boak
AppelleeS & S BUILDERS, LLCJ. Stan Wolfe
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionJohn William Renneisen
Steven R. Czoschke
Kristi Marie Radosevich
Bruce A. Salzburg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Evidence, Other, Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2008 WY 84
Citation:188 P.3d 554 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/06/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/06/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/06/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/23/2007Notice-Incoming - Other - notice of substitution of counselNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
08/13/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/26/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/26/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/28/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
10/11/2007Brief - Appellee, received copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on cdBriefAppelleeFinal
10/19/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/01/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/08/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, agency record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
12/18/2007Notice-Internal - Recusal memo from Justice BurkeNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
12/19/2007Order - Assignment of judgeOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
07/18/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/22/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion for attorney's fees and costsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/22/2008Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
08/20/2008Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
08/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/20/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/20/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/25/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/22/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal