Case: 10-14-00222-CV
10-14-00222-CV
07/29/2014
Interlocutory
Lochridge-Priest, Inc.
Ronald L. Kroll
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/07/2014 | Reply brief filed | Appellant | |
09/17/2014 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee | |
09/16/2014 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Intervenor | |
08/27/2014 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/28/2015 | Case stored | | |||
09/28/2015 | Mandate issued | | |||
09/28/2015 | Bill of costs | | |||
06/11/2015 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Grant motion | | ||
06/11/2015 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||
06/11/2015 | Retention time case file will be retained | | |||
06/11/2015 | Judgment Issued | | |||
05/27/2015 | Motion to dismiss filed | | |||
02/25/2015 | Case reinstated | | |||
02/20/2015 | Letter from parties or mediator concerning mediation result | | |||
01/13/2015 | Letter issued by the court | | |||
12/31/2014 | Submitted | | |||
12/18/2014 | Mediation order entered |
| |||
12/12/2014 | Recusal of appellate court justice(s) | | |||
12/04/2014 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||
10/07/2014 | Reply brief filed | | |||
09/17/2014 | Case ready to be set | | |||
09/17/2014 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||
09/16/2014 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||
08/27/2014 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||
08/08/2014 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
08/07/2014 | Reporters record filed | | |||
08/05/2014 | Clerks record filed | | |||
07/29/2014 | Amended notice of appeal filed | | |||
07/29/2014 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||
07/11/2014 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/27/2021 | Case Stored | Send 6 year letter in cv cases |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Kroll, Ronald L. | Appellee | Mark S. Werbner |
PJC Logistics | Intervenor | Christie L. Ryan Andrea Mehta Jim Dunnam |
Lochridge-Priest, Inc. | Appellant | Michael L. Scanes |
Trial Court Information
170th District Court
McLennan
Honorable Jim Meyer
2014-2453-4
Suzanne Hanus