judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THREE WAY, INC., a Wyoming Corporation v. BURTON ENTERPRISES, INC., a Wyoming Corporation

Case Heading (S-07-0139)
Case Number:S-07-0139Case Docketed On:06/28/2007
Linked To: S-07-0140
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Johnson CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:THREE WAY, INC., a Wyoming Corporation v. BURTON ENTERPRISES, INC., a Wyoming Corporation
Full Title:THREE WAY, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. BURTON ENTERPRISES, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThree Way, Inc.Greg L. Goddard
Christopher Michael Wages
AppelleeBurton Enterprises, Inc., a Wyoming corporationMark W. Gifford

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Contracts, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 18
Citation:177 P.3d 219

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/28/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/28/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/28/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/26/2007Correspondence - Incoming from counsel for appellee re motions pending in district court. Copied staff attorney for reviewCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
08/09/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
08/14/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record - amended.Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
09/24/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/26/2007Brief - Replacement of Page 11, brief of appelleeBriefReplacementFinal
10/01/2007Brief - Other -supplement to brief of appellant Three Way, Inc. (Appendix)BriefOtherFinal
10/10/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/10/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/12/2007Motion - Oral argument - Reschedule oral argumentMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
10/12/2007Order - Other - Rescheduling oral argument (moved from 11/14/07 to 11/15/07)OrderOtherFinal
10/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mark W. Gifford on behalf of Appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/18/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Christopher M. WagesNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Christopher M. Wages for Three Way, Inc.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/23/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volumes I & II, original papers; Volume III, transcripts; Volume IV, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/15/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Greg L. Goddard for Three Way, Inc. and Mark W. Gifford for Burton Enterprises, Inc.) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/15/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/21/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/10/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/10/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/12/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal