judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DEGRASSE (FRANK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32033
Short Caption:DEGRASSE (FRANK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34542
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR961126Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/15/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/25/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/25/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
04/01/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Filed March 27, 1998.
04/29/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Re: Records on Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings, in each of the above-identified appeals. fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 32033, 32072, 32127, 32166, 32181, 32205.
05/14/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. For Court Appointed Appellant Counsel (Received the original and 1 copy.)
05/15/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal.
05/15/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/14/1999Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Request for ruling on Motion for an Appointed Counsel. (Received original only.)
11/02/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from the State: 30 days from the date of this order. 00-19283
11/16/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 00-20161
01/31/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. " . . . we remand this case to the district court to conduct an evidentiary hearing to determine whether appellant's counsel failed to file a direct appeal after appellant expressed an interest in a direct appeal." fn1[This order constitutes our final disposition of the appeal. Any subsequent appeal from an order of the district court denying appellant's Lozada claim and his other additional claims shall be docketd as a new matter.] fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-02022
02/27/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal this day. 01-02095
02/27/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/08/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 2, 2001. 01-02095