judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

REED (ROBERT) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 31786
Short Caption:REED (ROBERT) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR94P2542Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/20/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/06/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
02/06/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
02/18/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
03/25/1998Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement.
04/01/1998MotionFiled Motion. To File Late Docketing Statement.
04/03/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We grant appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement. The clerk shall file the docketing statement, submitted provisionally on March 25, 1998.
04/03/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
03/15/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, file and serve the case appeal statement, request for transcript form or certificate of no transcript, the opening brief and appendix, or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against appellant's counsel or should appellant no longer wish to pursue this appeal, file the appropriate motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal.
03/24/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause.
03/24/2000Other Other. Filed Notice of No Transcript.
04/11/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On March 24, 2000, appellant's counsel filed a response to the show cause order filed on March 15, 2000. This appeal is governed by NRAP 3 and NRAP 3B but not NRAP 3C. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file the opening brief and appendix or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against appellant's counsel.
04/21/2000BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Hand delivered 4/21/00.)
04/21/2000AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief.
05/19/2000BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: 5/18/00.)
11/20/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/18/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 01-01116
02/13/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-01200
02/13/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 16, 2001. 01-01200