judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MOZELLA JONES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0984
Short Caption:MOZELLA JONES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-2519-09Filed Date:06/21/2010

Opening Event Date:06/21/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/22/2013
Argued/Submitted:10/08/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/05/2015
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMozzella Jones Y
Barbara E. KittayYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Kathryn L. RakoczyYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/21/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL (CourtView docket entry shows the Notice of Appeal was initially filed on 6/20/10 incomplete)
08/23/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (JAC)
09/23/2010MOT TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE STMT RE TRANSCRIPT for 30 days
10/07/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the statement regarding transcript, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted, and the statement regarding transcript shall be filed with this court on or before October 22, 2010. (Castillo)
10/22/2010COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS and for an extension of time to file the statement regarding transcript. Granted
11/05/2010ORDERED that the motion of counsel for appellant is granted and the appearance of Kevin McCants, Esquire, is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record, and Thomas Engle, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant herein. Kevin McCants, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to this appeal to newly-appointed counsel forthwith. F/O that newly-appinted counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (ETW)
11/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (8 pgs/Hawkins) 3/8/10 proc. a.m.
11/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (81 pgs/White) 3/8/10 proc.
11/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (174 pgs/White) 3/9/10 proc.
11/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (156 pgs/White) 3/10/10 proc.
11/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (190 pgs/White) 3/11/10 proc.
11/09/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (556 pgs/Geddes) 3/15,17-19/10 proc.
11/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (77 pgs/Maar) 3/22/10 proc. w/cd
11/16/2010RECORD INDEX
11/16/2010RECORD COPIES
11/29/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
12/01/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/07/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF pending completion of transcript. no oppo
03/02/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, wherein appellant indicate(s) that transcript is being prepared, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date the transcript is filed with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that apellant shall advise this court within 15 days thereof of appellant's receipt of the ordered transcript. (JAC)
04/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (86 pgs/McCarn) 3/18/10 proc. w/cd
04/20/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/12/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 2, 2011, wherein appellant was directed to file the brief within 40 days from the date the trancsript is filed with this court, and it appearing that the transcript has been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall file the brief and limited appendix within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 10/20/11
06/22/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before October 20, 2011. (Castillo)
09/08/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - Appendix, Brief until the completion of transcripts and production of exhibits (Titled: motion to vacate briefing schedule) (no oppo) (Appellant)
09/08/2011FiledMotion - Ex- parte for issuance of an expert voucher for preparation of transcript of 911 call introduced as evidence at trial (Appellant)
09/27/2011FiledOrder Granting MOTION FOR EXPERT VOUCHER and VACATING BRIEFING ORDER
01/18/2012FiledOrder directing appellant to advise this court w/n 15 days as to the status of the transcript.
01/24/2012FiledStatement to the Court regarding the status of the 911 transcript (Appellant)
03/14/2012FiledBriefing Order
04/24/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Denied Without Prejudice
05/01/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 8/27/12.
08/29/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw Under Anders (Appellant)Granted in Part/Denied in Part
09/11/2012FiledAPPELLANT SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 3, 2012
09/11/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO WITHDRW (ANDERS)//RESPONSE
10/01/2012FiledAnders Response (Appellant)
01/11/2013FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW and the APPOINTMENT of T. ENGLE is VACATED and B. KITTAY IS APPOINTED TO REPRESENT APPELLANT and APPELALNT'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/N 90 DAYS
02/22/2013FiledBrief (Appellant)
02/22/2013FiledAppendix (Appellant)
03/21/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
03/26/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting VMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 4/25/13
04/22/2013FiledBrief (Appellee)
04/22/2013FiledBriefing Completed
05/06/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
06/03/2013FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
06/05/2013FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
08/30/2013FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/08/2013FiledArgued Before Associate Judge Thompson, Associate Judge Easterly, and Senoir Judge Nebeker. ( Barbara E. Kittay Esq., for appellant) ( Kathryn L. Rakoczy Esq.,for appellee).
10/09/2013FiledMotion To Stay Appeal (Appellant)
10/10/2013VacatedOrder Sua Sponte staying appeal pending resolution of the trial court proceedings.
01/06/2014FiledStatus Report of Motion Pending in the Superior Court Under Title 23, D.C. Code, Section 110 (Appellant)
04/02/2014FiledStatus Report regarding pending 23-110 (Appellant)
07/02/2014FiledStatus Report regarding pending 23-110 in Superior Court. (Appellant)
09/26/2014FiledStatus Report regarding pending 23-110 (Appellant)
01/02/2015FiledStatus Report regarding pending 23-100 (Appellant)
02/04/2015FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant)Granted
02/05/2015FiledORDER VACATING STAY ENTERED ON 10/10/13 and F/O GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS and to REMAND and F/O DIRECTING the CLERK TO ISSUE the MANDATE FORTHWITH
02/05/2015FiledDismissed and Remanded
02/05/2015FiledMandate