judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BARBARA J. LASEN and PAUL S. LASEN, wife and husband v. SAMUEL L. ANDERSON, Deceased; TRICIA L. ROHLOFF; and LEE C. ANDERSON and FIRST NATIONAL BANK, TRUSTEE OF THE ANDERSON FAMILY IRREVOCABLE TRUST NO. 1 DATED AUGUST 14, 1997

Case Heading (S-07-0138)
Case Number:S-07-0138Case Docketed On:06/28/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:BARBARA J. LASEN and PAUL S. LASEN, wife and husband v. SAMUEL L. ANDERSON, Deceased; TRICIA L. ROHLOFF; and LEE C. ANDERSON and FIRST NATIONAL BANK, TRUSTEE OF THE ANDERSON FAMILY IRREVOCABLE TRUST NO. 1 DATED AUGUST 14, 1997
Full Title:BARBARA J. LASEN and PAUL S. LASEN, wife and husband, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. SAMUEL L. ANDERSON, Deceased; TRICIA L. ROHLOFF; and LEE C. ANDERSON, Appellees (Defendants), and FIRST NATIONAL BANK, TRUSTEE OF THE ANDERSON FAMILY IRREVOCABLE TRUST NO. 1 DATED AUGUST 14, 1997, Appellee (Intervenor).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBarbara J. LasenJerry M. Smith
AppellantPaul S. LasenJerry M. Smith
AppelleeSamuel L. AndersonHoward P. Olsen Jr.
AppelleeTricia L. RohloffHoward P. Olsen Jr.
AppelleeLee C. AndersonHoward P. Olsen Jr.
IntervenorFirst National BankHoward P. Olsen Jr.

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Other, Property - Real
Opinion Number:2008 WY 80
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/28/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/28/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/28/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/06/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant. Appellant put number of days requested in his cover letter, but not in motion before the Court. Prepared order based on request in letterMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/06/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/14/2007Brief - AppellantsBriefAppellantFinal
10/11/2007Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
10/11/2007Service - Certificate of serviceServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
10/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/29/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/07/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volumes. Volume I, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
11/08/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/14/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Howard P. Olsen, Jr. for appelleesNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/15/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jerry Smith for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/13/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Jerry M. Smith for appellants; Howard P. Olsen, Jr. for appellees and intervenors) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/13/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/14/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/30/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/30/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/04/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/1/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal