judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ALEX M. FERGUSON, TEMPORARY ADMINISTRATOR v. JOE FERGUSON

Case: A-419
A-419
11/04/1944
Direct Appeal
ALEX M. FERGUSON, TEMPORARY ADMINISTRATOR
JOE FERGUSON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/27/1945Brief on the Merits
09/04/1945Letter brief
02/03/1945Letter brief
01/25/1945Supplemental Brief filed
01/13/1945Motion for Rehearing
01/04/1945Letter brief
12/28/1944Letter brief
12/22/1944Exhibits in case/cause filed
12/22/1944Exhibits in case/cause filed
12/21/1944Direct Appeal filed
11/24/1944Letter brief
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/09/1949Returned document(s). See Remarks.
12/27/1945Miscellaneous letter
12/27/1945Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
12/27/1945Brief on the Merits
12/05/1945Letter Filed
09/04/1945Letter brief
08/31/1945Letter Filed
04/03/1945Letter Filed
02/03/1945Miscellaneous Motion
02/03/1945Letter brief
02/03/1945Letter Filed
02/01/1945Letter Filed
01/31/1945Letter Filed
01/25/1945Supplemental Brief filed
01/22/1945Response to Motion filed
01/22/1945Letter Filed
01/13/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/04/1945Letter brief
12/28/1944Letter brief
12/22/1944Exhibits in case/cause filed
12/22/1944Exhibits in case/cause filed
12/21/1944Direct Appeal filed
11/24/1944Letter brief
11/04/1944Document filed (see remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Alex M. Ferguson, Temporary AdministratorAppellant
Joe FergusonAppellee
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information