Case: 03-09-00465-CR
03-09-00465-CR
08/03/2009
Aggravated Robbery
John Crayton
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/09/2012 | Case stored | | |||||
11/09/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||
11/05/2009 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |||||
10/27/2009 | Mandate issued | | |||||
10/27/2009 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed on Appellant's Motion |
| ||||
10/27/2009 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
10/26/2009 | Submitted | | |||||
10/19/2009 | Motion to dismiss filed | | |||||
09/17/2009 | Fax received | | |||||
08/18/2009 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
08/03/2009 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/27/2009 | Case Stored | Case stored |
10/27/2034 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | The Honorable Rosemary Lehmberg |
Crayton, John | Criminal - Appellant | Mr. Paul M. Evans |
Trial Court Information
331st District Court
Travis
Honorable Bob Perkins
D-1-DC-08-302486
cnt I thru VI - 10 yrs/probated for 10; cnt XIV - 6 yrs