Case: 05-92-00918-CV
05-92-00918-CV
04/17/1992
Mandamus
Humphreys, Lloyd E.
Michael J. O'Neill, Judge, 193rd District Court, Dallas Coun
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/14/2004 | Order Entered | Destroy | |
02/06/2004 | Record Pickup | | |
05/11/1992 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/11/1992 | Motion to Strike Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
05/11/1992 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/08/1992 | Response to Motion | | |
05/07/1992 | Motion to Strike | | |
04/24/1992 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Denied | |
04/24/1992 | Motion for Leave to File | | |
04/24/1992 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
04/24/1992 | Response to Motion | | |
04/23/1992 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
04/22/1992 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
04/17/1992 | MattConv | | |
04/17/1992 | Motion for Leave to File | | |
04/17/1992 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/17/1992 | Motion to Stay | | |
04/17/1992 | Motion to stay disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/17/1992 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/14/2004 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
193rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Adolph P Canales
91-06567-L