judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JESUS CERVANTES ESCARCEGA v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Heading (06-58)
Case Number:06-58Case Docketed On:03/17/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:JESUS CERVANTES ESCARCEGA v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Full Title:JESUS CERVANTES ESCARCEGA, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJesus Cervantes EscarcegaR. Michael Vang
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationPatrick J. Crank
Robin Sessions Cooley
Douglas J. Moench
Dana Jill Lent

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 38
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/17/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/17/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/17/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/17/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/01/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record; and copy of brief on disk. District Court record returned to this court; counsel for appellee will pick-up. Original copy of desigination sent to district court clerk.BriefAppellantFinal
05/01/2006Correspondence - Outgoing. Letter to district court clerk. Record was returned to this court with brief of appellant. Counsel for appellee was contacted and picked it up from our office today. Original designation of record was enclosed with letter.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
06/14/2006Brief - Appellee; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
06/15/2006Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (Appellant's)Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/28/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/28/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/05/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/07/2006Event - Phone Call. Received call from district court clerk's office regarding record. The record is still at the Attorney General's office.EventPhone CallFinal
07/31/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, agency record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/31/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/08/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/26/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/26/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/29/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Signed for on 3/27/07 by L. Glode.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal