judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TIMOTHY STURGIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0956
Short Caption:TIMOTHY STURGIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD27291-09Filed Date:07/27/2010

Opening Event Date:07/27/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/22/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/29/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/04/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTimothy Sturgis YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/27/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/17/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that David Carey Woll, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
08/17/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) David Carey Woll, Esquire
09/23/2010 On consideration of this court's order of AUGUST 17, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
09/23/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
09/23/2010RECEIVED - aplt's statement re transcript.
10/13/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (By: JAC)
10/13/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
10/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (21pgs/Tape) 12/31/09 proc.
10/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (133pgs/Tape) 3/5/10 proc. (Inserts)
10/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (9pgs/Tape) 3/5/10 proc.
10/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (4pgs/Tape) 3/11/10 proc.
10/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (13pgs/Tape) 7/26/10 proc. w/CD
10/22/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/26/2010RECORD INDEX
10/26/2010RECORD COPIES
10/26/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (Trial Court pleadings) ******SEALED******
10/27/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/18/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 1/4/11
12/07/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 4, 2011. (By: JAC)
01/14/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 7, 2010, granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before January 4, 2011, and it appearing that the brief and limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion shall set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
01/19/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 3/1/11. no oppo
02/02/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 1, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
02/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (9pgs/Tape) 7/26/10 proc. w/CD
02/02/2011APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE- to court order
02/25/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/25/2011APPENDIX (attached to brief)
04/01/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/01/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/08/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
07/28/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/29/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Thompson, Ruiz, Newman
10/13/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson, Associate Judges, Ruiz, Associate Judge, retired, and Newman, Senior Judge.)
11/02/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
11/04/2011FiledMandate