judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-390
A-390
12/01/1944
Application for Writ of Error
W. B. ATCHISON
TEXAS AND PACIFIC RAILWAY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/29/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/23/1945Response to Brief filedPetitioner
01/22/1945Brief on the MeritsRespondent
12/09/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
12/01/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/18/1945Letter Filed
03/29/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/20/1945Response to Motion filed
01/23/1945Response to Brief filed
01/22/1945Brief on the Merits
01/08/1945Bond
12/30/1944Document received (See Remarks)
12/09/1944Response to Petition
12/05/1944Letter Filed
12/01/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/01/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. B. AtchisonPetitioner
Texas and Pacific Railway CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information