judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAMS VS. LAS VEGAS CITY COUNCIL

Case Information: 42038
Short Caption:WILLIAMS VS. LAS VEGAS CITY COUNCILCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A460607Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/02/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/16/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Kenneth K. Williams--check no. 1041.
09/16/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-15446
09/19/2003Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcript requested: August 4, 2003. Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentine. Filed in district court: no file-stamp (FILED PER ORDER OF 8/26/05). 03-15750
09/24/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. A460607: 120 days. fn2[See NRAP 11(a)(2) (providing that the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.)] The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 03-16002
01/07/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 7. 04-00322
01/07/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/11/2004BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief (FILED PER ORDER OF 8/26/05). 04-02716
02/11/2004Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Appellant's Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief (FILED PER ORDER OF 8/26/05). 04-02719
03/03/2004BriefReceived Answering Brief. Respondent City Council (FILED PER ORDER OF 8/26/05). 04-04016
03/05/2004MotionFiled Stipulation. 04-04253
04/12/2004BriefReceived Answering Brief. Respondent Bonanza Realty, Inc.'s Answering Brief (FILED PER ORDER OF 8/26/05). 04-06724
08/26/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Briefs and Supplemental Record. We have received the joint appendix, appellant's opening brief and appendix, respondents' answering briefs, and appellant's reply brief, and direct the court clerk to file these documents. We also grant appellant's unopposed January 22, 2004 motion to supplement this court's records. We direct the district court clerk to transmit, within sixty days of the date of this order, the Exhibits in Case No. A460607. To date, we have not received the requested transcript. Accordingly, court reporter Valentin shall have thirty days to comply with NRAP 9(b) or to otherwise explain why no transcript has been prepared. Fn1 [We also direct the court clerk to file appellant's motion to supplement this court's records, which was provisionally received on January 22, 2004.] Fn3 [The court clerk is directed to file appellant's request for transcript, which was provisionally received on September 19, 2003. Fn4 [In light of this order, we disapprove as moot the January 13, 2004 stipulation for extension of time to file appellant's opening brief and the March 5, 2004 stipulation for extension of time to file the answering brief. The Honorable Miriam Shearing, Senior Justice, and the Honorable Deborah A. Agosti, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment entered on July 14, 2005.] 05-16961
08/26/2005Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcript requested: August 4, 2003. Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentine. 03-15750
08/26/2005Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Joint Appendix, Vols. 1 through 3. 04-00589
08/26/2005MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Motion to Supplement Supreme Court Records. 04-01334
08/26/2005BriefFiled Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. 04-02716
08/26/2005Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appellant's Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief. 04-02719
08/26/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent City Council. 04-04016
08/26/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent Bonanza Realty, Inc.'s Answering Brief. 04-06724
08/26/2005BriefFiled Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. 04-08643
09/02/2005Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision. Resubmitted on Briefs.
09/07/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 08/04/03. Court Reporter: Yvonne Valentin. 05-17623
03/30/2006MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. 06-06671
04/24/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . we dismiss this appeal." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees, if any. fn1[NRAP 42(b).] NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-08546
04/24/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
05/01/2007RemittiturIssued Return Letter. Returned Exhibits: certified copy of the Videotape that was made by the City Clerk of the City Council hearing of 11-20-02. Certified copies of the City Council Proceedings with attachments: Exhibit A-Agenda Summary Page of Planning Commission Meeting of July 25, 2002 (A-0046-02); Exhibit B-Agenda Summary Page of Planning Commission Meeting of September 12, 2202 (Z-0046-02); Exhibit C-Agenda Summary Page of Planning Commission Meeting of September 12, 2002 (U-014-02). Points and Authorities with attachments: October 18, 2001 Planning Commission Item B-24; Las Vegas Zoning Code; Las Vegas Downtown Centennial Plan; Las Vegas Master Plan 2020 (Two volumes, one of Master Plan Elements and one of Master Plan Appendicies); Downtown Neighborhood 2000 Plan; Redevelopment Plan for the Downtown Redevelopment Plan Area to Clark County District Court Clerk, Charles J. Short. 07-09735
05/09/2007Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Notice of Return of Exhibits. Received by County Clerk on May 4, 2007. 07-09735