judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-7543
B-7543
04/18/1978
Application for Writ of Error
NANCY KWAY DAVIS
TENNESEE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/24/1978Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/12/1978Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/05/1978Response to PetitionRespondent
04/18/1978Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/31/1978Response to Motion filed
07/24/1978Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/12/1978Reply to Response
05/05/1978Response to Petition
04/18/1978Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/18/1978Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Nancy Kway DavisPetitioner
Tennesee Life Insurance CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information