judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BOLDEN (ANTHONY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42039
Short Caption:BOLDEN (ANTHONY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41714 , 42011 , 42046 , 42067 , 47767 , 48884 , 51957 , 55607 , 65651 , 69629 , 69629-COA , 73884 , 73884-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C189058Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/12/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/16/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/16/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15460
09/16/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: February 20, 2003, March 27, 2003, April 8, 2003, June 15, 2003, June 16, 2003, June 19, 2003, June 23, 2003, June 24, 2003, August 14, 2003 and August 28, 2003. To Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. "MISSING" 03-15461
10/02/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-16402
10/16/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 02/20/03, 03/27/03, 04/08/03, 06/16/03 (Delwin V. Lewis), 06/19/03, 06/23/03, 06/24/03, 06/25/03, 08/14/03, and 08/28/03. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. 03-17262
11/26/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, all the requested transcripts have been filed with the exception of the proceedings for June 15, 2003. Court reporter Tom Mercer shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the requested transcript for June 15, 2003. If more time is needed to complete the preparation of the transcript, Mr. Mercer shall, within the same time period, file a motion requesting an extension of time and stating the reason for the extension. If the requested transcript cannot be produced, Mr. Mercer, shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. 03-19799
12/23/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Tom Mercer (Court Reporter) regarding Order to File Transcripts.
01/21/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-01219
01/21/2004AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 04-01220
02/24/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. 04-03514
03/26/2004BriefFiled Reply Brief. 04-05680
05/12/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Transcripts. Upon further review of the district court minutes, we note that there was no court proceeding on June 14, 2003. Accordingly, we conclude appellant's request for the June 15, 2003, transcript was improper and we vacate our November 26, 2003, order directing Mr. Mercer to file and serve the June 15, 2003, transcript. 04-08871
03/02/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 05-04127
03/02/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP05-WM/MD/RP
07/12/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order for En Banc Consideration and Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. This matter was submitted for decision without oral argument to the Northern Nevada Panel on March 2, 2005. We have determined that en banc consideration of this appeal is warranted. This appeal shall stand submitted for decision without oral argument to the En Banc Court as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. NRAP 34(f)(1). 05-13810
07/12/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the En Banc Court. EN BANC
09/27/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney Joel Mann requesting a duplicate copy of the appendix to the opening brief. 05-19171
09/29/2005AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. (Replacement copy). 04-01220
12/15/2005Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part and remanded." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Rose, J. Becker, C.J., Maupin, Gibbons, Douglas, Hardesty and Parraguirre. 121 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 86. EN BANC. 05-24429
01/10/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-00046
01/10/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/19/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 12, 2006. 06-00046
03/10/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to the Publishers from Cay Jordan, Editor. Correction on page 19, paragraph 1, last line of the original opinion filed December 15, 2006.