Case Information: 87-FM-1224 | |||
Short Caption: | BOWSER, SAMUEL SCOTT BOWSER, MARIA WILSON | Classification: | Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | D1477-83 | Filed Date: | 10/26/1987 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 10/26/1987 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 08/26/1988 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | BOWSER, SAMUEL SCOTT BOWSER, MARIA WILSON | |||
10/26/1987 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
10/30/1987 | DESIGNATION OF RECORD & STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/30/1987 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/30/1987 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/06/1987 | $5 PAID TO DC TREASURER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/11/1987 | RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) JB PANEL SCDATE 122987 SCHPRD R | |||
04/25/1988 | ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 011188 SCHPRD RT | |||
07/14/1988 | ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 10 DAYS OR CASE DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD BA | |||
08/05/1988 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition | ||
08/05/1988 | ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD BA | |||
08/05/1988 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE | |||
08/26/1988 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |