judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SARINANA (MIGUEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 43972
Short Caption:SARINANA (MIGUEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36600
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C141776Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/07/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/21/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-17453
10/05/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-18402
10/07/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/23/04. To Court Reporter: Angela Lee. 04-18617
12/20/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] To date, Ms. Lee has not filed the requested transcript. Ms. Lee shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the requested transcript. If more time is needed to complete the preparation of the transcript, Ms. Lee shall, within the same time period, file a motion requesting an extension of time and stating the reason for the extension. If the requested transcript cannot be produced, Ms. Lee shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. 04-23187
01/06/2005Other Returned Mail. Order filed 12/20/04 addressed to Court Reporter Angela Lee remailed to corrected address.
01/13/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 8/23/04. Court Reporter: Angela K. Lee. 05-00830
01/21/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-01360
01/21/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 3. 05-01361
02/08/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 05-02517
02/08/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 05-02518
03/07/2005BriefFiled Reply Brief. 05-04477
03/07/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. 05-04478
03/07/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/20/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-12035
07/15/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-12868
07/15/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/28/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 18, 2005. 05-12868