judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

YOUNG VS. DIST. CT. (MCKAY)

Case Information: 43973
Short Caption:YOUNG VS. DIST. CT. (MCKAY)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A460332Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Ashby & Ranalli, LLP--check no. 5066.
09/21/2004Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 04-17452
09/21/2004AppendixFiled Appendix, Volume 1. 04-17454
09/21/2004AppendixFiled Appendix, Volume 2. 04-23859
09/21/2004AppendixFiled Appendix, Volume 3. 04-23860
09/21/2004AppendixFiled Appendix, Volume 4. 04-23861
09/21/2004AppendixFiled Appendix, Volume 5. 04-23862
09/21/2004Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Affidavit. Due Date: 10 days
09/24/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "We deny the petition." SNP04S-MS/RR/MD 04-17720
09/27/2004MotionFiled Motion. Respondents' Request this Court not Entertain Petitioners' Improper Writ of Mandate. 04-17842
10/01/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On September 24, 2004, we denied this original petition for a writ of mandamus. We therefore deny as moot respondents' motion requesting that we not entertain the petition. 04-18192
10/19/2004RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 04-17940
10/19/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.