judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LYONS (MUN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 43986
Short Caption:LYONS (MUN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR041623Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/22/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/22/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 04-17567
09/22/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: July 21, 2004 and August 20, 2004. Court Reporter: I. Zihn and L. Clarkson. Filed in district court on: September 17, 2004. 04-17568
10/05/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 8/20/04. Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. 04-18374
10/27/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-19904
10/27/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement.
11/16/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-21042
01/31/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-01909
02/25/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-02173
02/25/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/09/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 1, 2005 05-02173