judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BREAKMAN (ANTONIO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 43974
Short Caption:BREAKMAN (ANTONIO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44246 , 45521 , 48857 , 56972
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C201693Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/21/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 04-17456
09/24/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 04-17738
10/06/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 04-18540
10/19/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[This dismissal is without prejudice to appellant's right to file and perfect a timely appeal following the district court's pronouncement of the sentence.] NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-19331
11/16/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-19674
11/16/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/06/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 18, 2004. 04-19674